EP0361059 - Non-electrification polymeric composite material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12 Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Kiyofumi 2-21-21, Hitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Yasuyuki 22-1, Shonai-Saiwaimachi 4-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Omori, Mitsugu 5-1, Kishibe-naka 3-chome Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115173.0 | 17.08.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | JP19880214502 | 29.08.1988 Original published format: JP 21450288 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361059 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/20, H01B1/22, H01B1/24 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
H01B1/24 (EP,US);
C08L27/18 (KR);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
H01B1/20 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L27/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/14] | Title | German: | Nichtelektrifiziertes polymerisches Verbundstoffmaterial | [1990/14] | English: | Non-electrification polymeric composite material | [1990/14] | French: | Matériau composite polymére non électrifié | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1996/23] | 15.01.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62223255 ; | [A]EP0197781 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [A]EP0085413 ; | [X]US4664846 (ENJO NAONORI [JP], et al); | [XP]WO8807063 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0312077 (DU PONT [US]) | [A] - DATABASE DERWENT WORLD PATENT INDEX, no. AN - 87-316515; & JP-A-62 223 255 (ASAHI GLASS K.K.) 01-10-1987, & JP62223255 A 00000000 |