EP0356818 - Circuitry for driving a load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 D-81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirschmann, Walter Fauststrasse 70 D-8000 München 82 / DE | [1990/10] | Application number, filing date | 89115183.9 | 17.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | DE19883829388 | 30.08.1988 Original published format: DE 3829388 | [1990/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356818 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356818 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356818 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/29, H02M1/00 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
H05B41/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/10] | H05B41/29 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/10] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb einer Last | [1990/10] | English: | Circuitry for driving a load | [1990/10] | French: | Circuit alimentant une charge | [1990/10] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3233655 (ZUMTOBEL AG [AT]); | [Y]FR2416617 (SIGNAUX ENTR ELECTRIQUES [FR]); | [AP]EP0323676 (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]DE2461440 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [AD]GB2022943 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4533986 (JONES DWIGHT V [US]) |