EP0355733 - Amino or hydrazino peroxides, derivatives and their uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102-3222 / US | ||
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. Three Parkway Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19102 / US | ||
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states PENNWALT CORPORATION Pennwalt Building Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanchez, José 1624 Huth Road Grand Island New York 14072 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115258.9 | 18.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880233643 | 18.08.1988 Original published format: US 233643 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0355733 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355733 | Date: | 08.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C409/40, C07D323/06, C08K5/20, C08K5/25, C08F4/34, C08F4/36 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
C07D207/404 (EP,US);
C07C243/28 (EP,US);
C07C243/38 (EP,US);
C07C255/66 (EP,US);
C07C271/16 (EP,US);
C07C281/02 (EP,US);
C07C409/40 (EP,US);
C07D207/452 (EP,US);
C07D323/00 (EP,US);
C08F291/00 (EP,US);
C08F299/045 (EP,US);
C08F8/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/14, C08L23/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Amino oder Hydrazinoperoxide, Derivate und ihre Verwendungen | [1990/09] | English: | Amino or hydrazino peroxides, derivatives and their uses | [1990/09] | French: | Amino ou hydrazinoperoxydes, leurs dérivés et leurs applications | [1990/09] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 07.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4177204 (MAGELI ORVILLE L [US], et al); | [A]EP0056699 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]); | [A]GB2102413 (LOUGHBOROUGH CONSULT LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0233476 (PENNWALT CORP [US]); | [A]EP0260134 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | [A] - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE | [AD] - ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE | Examination | - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, vol. 101, no. 11, 1968, pages 3957-3969; C. RUECHARDT et al, "Acylamino-percarbonsäure-tert.-butylester" | - ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, vol. 85, no. 19, 1973, pages 850-860; E. G. E. HAWKINS, "Alpha-Peroxyamine" |