EP0358014 - Rolling cultivator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGRIKON MEZÖGAZDASAGI GEPGYARTO ÜZLETAG Dozsa György u. 44 Kiskörös / HU | [1990/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horváth, Benedek Szirom u. 26 Kecskemét / HU | 02 /
Horváthné, Cecilia Raffai Szirom u. 26 Kecskemét / HU | 03 /
Zöld, Ferenc Lenin u. 2 Jakabszállás / HU | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/11] | Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115269.6 | 18.08.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | HU19880004621 | 08.09.1988 Original published format: HU 462188 | [1990/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358014 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358014 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01B35/16 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
A01B35/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/11] | Title | German: | Rollhacke | [1990/11] | English: | Rolling cultivator | [1990/11] | French: | Rotoculteur-émotteur | [1990/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 27.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/29] | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2766675 (SUCK HARVEY M); | [A]US3435904 (RICE RUSSELL E); | [A]US3452826 (LEHMAN CHARLES L); | [AD]DE1457716 (LILLISTON IMPLEMENT COMPANY); | [AD]US3766988 (WHITESIDES J); | [AD]DE2528928 (DEERE & CO, et al); | [A]US4298071 (WHITFIELD CARROLL J, et al) |