Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.07.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |
03.01.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] |
06.12.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] |
16.05.1991 | First examination report | |
17.09.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.11.1990 [1990/45] |
31.01.1990 | Change - name/address | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] |
20.01.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] |