Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0356981
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
12.11.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
24.09.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] |
11.03.1993 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.04.1993 [1993/17] |
03.12.1992 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] |
20.03.1992 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] |
18.09.1991 |
First examination report |
|
28.03.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] |
14.02.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.04.1990 [1990/14] |
20.01.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] |