EP0356981 - Thermally-transferable fluorescent 7-aminocoumarins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byers, Gary Wayne c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 02 /
Chapman, Derek David c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115895.8 | 29.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | US19880238653 | 31.08.1988 Original published format: US 238653 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356981 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356981 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356981 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B41M5/385 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/10] | B41M5/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/10] | Title | German: | Auf thermischen Wege übertragbare fluoreszierende 7-Aminocoumarine | [1990/10] | English: | Thermally-transferable fluorescent 7-aminocoumarins | [1990/10] | French: | 7-Aminocoumarines fluorescentes transférables par la chaleur | [1990/10] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/20] | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.1992 | GR | 06.05.1992 | ES | 17.08.1992 | SE | 30.08.1992 | LU | 31.08.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
GR | 06.05.1992 | ||
SE | 30.08.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
SE | 30.08.1992 | ||
LU | 31.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/46] | AT | 06.05.1992 | |
SE | 30.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/03] | AT | 06.05.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5954598 ; | [AD]US4627997 (IDE YOUJI [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 158 (M-311)(1595) 21 July 1984, & JP-A-59 54598 (FUJI KAGAKU SHIKOUGIYOU K.K.) 29 March 1984,, & JP5954598 A 19840329 | [ ] - A |