EP0387396 - An electrically controlled mixing cock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORAS OY PL 40 26101 Rauma / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states ORAS OY PL 40 SF-26101 Rauma / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilsson, Pekka Waldemar Aarningonkatu 3 F-26100 Rauma / FI | 02 /
Rautavuori, Janne Tapio Monnankatu 23 B 2 F-26660 Rauma / FI | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115904.8 | 29.08.1989 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | FI19890001208 | 14.03.1989 Original published format: FI 891208 | [1990/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0387396 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0387396 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387396 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/13 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
G05D23/1393 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/38] | Title | German: | Elektrisch gesteuerte Mischarmatur | [1990/38] | English: | An electrically controlled mixing cock | [1990/38] | French: | Robinet mélangeur à commande électrique | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 28.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 20.04.1994 | LU | 31.08.1994 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3211188 (DANFOSS AS [DK]); | [Y]FR2535363 (KARRER WEBER & CIE AG [CH]); | [A]EP0184824 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0279043 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) |