EP0358094 - Process for preparing perborate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köster, Klaus, Dr. Hatzfelder Strasse 185 E D-5600 Wuppertal 2 / DE | 02 /
Carduck, Franz-Josef, Dr. Landstrasse 18 D-5657 Haan / DE | 03 /
Jahnke, Ulrich, Dr. Robert-Koch-Strasse 5 D-4019 Monheim / DE | 04 /
French, Seamus Hammer-Dorf-Strasse 104 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1990/11] | Application number, filing date | 89115952.7 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | DE19883830545 | 08.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3830545 | [1990/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358094 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358094 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16C3/00, F16C3/06, F16C7/00, F16C7/02 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
C01B15/126 (EP,US);
C01B15/123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/11] | C01B15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/48] |
Former [1990/11] | ES | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Perborat | [1990/11] | English: | Process for preparing perborate | [1990/11] | French: | Procédé de préparation de perborate | [1990/11] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/49: Verbunden mit 89909746.3/0433320 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 16.10.91 | EPB 1991/49: Consolidated with 89909746.3/0433320 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 16.10.91 | EPB 1991/49: Jointe à la demande no. 89909746.3/0433320 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 16.10.91 | Examination procedure | 23.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1037432 (DEGUSSA); | [A]DE1240508 (DEGUSSA); | [A]EP0155894 (ATOCHEM [FR]); | [AD]EP0194952 (ATOCHEM [FR]) |