EP0357018 - Nonwoven polyolefin filmfibril banner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De La Cruz, Danilo O. 7630 Comanche Drive Richmond Virginia 23225 / US | 02 /
Mc Cabe, Harold M. 4920 Lar Drive Richmond Virginia 23237 / US | 03 /
Shawcross, Jeffrey P. 9612, Jefferson Davis Highway - Lot Richmond Virginia 23227 / US | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/10] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89115980.8 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | US19880238635 | 30.08.1988 Original published format: US 238635 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0357018 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0357018 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0357018 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09F17/00 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
G09F15/0018 (EP,US);
G09F15/0025 (EP,US);
G09F17/00 (EP,US);
G09F7/18 (EP,US);
G09F2007/1886 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24198 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/10] | Title | German: | Fahne aus nichtgewebten Polyolefin-Film-Fibrillen | [1995/04] | English: | Nonwoven polyolefin filmfibril banner | [1990/10] | French: | Drapeau en film fibrillé de polyoléfine non tissé | [1990/10] |
Former [1990/10] | Fahne aus nichtgewebtem Polyolefin-Fibrillen-Film | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1144579 (HANS LIEBOLDT); | [A]US2911746 (EDWARD FREY); | [A]DE843351 (KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNG GES M B); | [A]DE3403751 (RAHMEN MIT SYSTEM GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2336927 (CROSS JAMES J); | [AD]US3169899 (WALTER STEUBER) |