blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0414939

EP0414939 - Vibrationless starting and braking control for transporting equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.1994
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.1994 [1994/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/10]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Koopmann, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing.
Lärchenweg 3
D-8520 Erlangen / DE
[1991/10]
Application number, filing date89116025.130.08.1989
[1991/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0414939
Date:06.03.1991
Language:DE
[1991/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0414939
Date:26.05.1993
Language:DE
[1993/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1990
ClassificationIPC:G05D13/62, B65G43/00
[1991/10]
CPC:
B65G43/00 (EP); H02P23/20 (EP); B65G2203/044 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/10]
TitleGerman:Schwingungsfreie Anfahr-und Bremsregelung für Förderanlagen[1991/10]
English:Vibrationless starting and braking control for transporting equipment[1991/10]
French:Régulateur pour le démarrage et le freinage sans vibrations pour un ensemble transporteur[1991/10]
Examination procedure07.08.1990Examination requested  [1991/10]
03.11.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.11.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.1993Fee for grant paid
18.02.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2161777  (WINSTER MINING LTD)
 [A]  - ELEKTRONIK. vol. 34, no. 2, Januar 1985, MUNCHEN DE Seiten 53 - 57; P.F. Orlowski: "Fahrkurvenrechner für die Antriebstechnik"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.