blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0357076

EP0357076 - Inclined rectangular pattern generating system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.06.1996
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.07.1996 [1996/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/10]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kubota, Kazuhiro
c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
[1995/32]
Former [1990/10]01 / Kubota, Kazuhiro
c/o NEC Corporation 33-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/10]Betten & Resch
Reichenbachstrasse 19
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date89116145.731.08.1989
[1990/10]
Priority number, dateJP1988021728931.08.1988         Original published format: JP 21728988
JP1988024637730.09.1988         Original published format: JP 24637788
[1990/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0357076
Date:07.03.1990
Language:EN
[1990/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0357076
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0357076
Date:09.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.11.1991
ClassificationIPC:G09G1/14, G06T15/00, G06T3/00
[1995/32]
CPC:
G06T11/203 (EP,US); G09G5/20 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1991/51]G09G1/14, G06F15/72, G06F15/62
Former IPC [1990/10]G06F15/62
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1990/10]
TitleGerman:System zum Generieren einer geneigten rechteckigen Form[1990/10]
English:Inclined rectangular pattern generating system[1990/10]
French:Système de génération d'une forme rectangulaire inclinée[1990/10]
Examination procedure20.06.1990Examination requested  [1990/33]
01.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.01.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.1995Fee for grant paid
06.04.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.05.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0229693  (IBM [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.