EP0414954 - Solenoid powered seat latch preferably for motor cars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIPOWEC, Walter A. Via C. Ravizza 22 I-20149 Milano / IT | [1991/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/10] | Application number, filing date | 89116167.1 | 01.09.1989 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414954 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414954 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/00, B60N2/04 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
B60R25/014 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/10] | B60R25/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/10] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Sitzverstellung vorzüglich für Kraftahrzeuge | [1991/10] | English: | Solenoid powered seat latch preferably for motor cars | [1991/10] | French: | Verrouillage de siège, commandé par solenoide, de préférence pour voitures à moteur | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 18.10.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 11.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.11.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.02.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.02.1994 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2587663 ; | [A]US3516704 ; | [A]EP0108581 ; | [A]WO8101121 |