EP0357086 - Image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Tsuyoshi 2-10, Chiyogaoka 7-chome Asao-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/10] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif-Roth Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89116209.1 | 01.09.1989 | [1990/10] | Priority number, date | JP19880218276 | 02.09.1988 Original published format: JP 21827688 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0357086 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0357086 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0357086 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
G03G15/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/10] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsgerät | [1990/10] | English: | Image forming apparatus | [1990/10] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [1990/10] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 10.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6170571 ; | [A]JP61103178 ; | [A]JP61126585 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 241 (P-488)[2297], 20th August 1986; & JP-A-61 70 571 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. CO., LTD) 14-04-1986, & JP6170571 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 284 (P-501)[2340], 26th September 1986; & JP-A-61 103 178 (CANON INC.) 21-05-1986, & JP61103178 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 316 (P-510)[2372], 28th October 1986; & JP-A-61 126 585 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. CO., LTD) 14-06-1986, & JP61126585 A 00000000 |