Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] |
04.11.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] |
04.08.1992 | First examination report | |
06.12.1991 | Change - representative | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] |
10.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] |
17.09.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 07.11.1990 [1990/45] |
20.01.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] |