EP0374372 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukumara, Kenichiro c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Nagasaki Works 6-14, Maruomachi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki / JP | 02 /
Yoshioka, Kazuo c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. Nagasaki Works 6-14, Maruomachi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki / JP | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89116352.9 | 05.09.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | JP19880322106 | 22.12.1988 Original published format: JP 32210688 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374372 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374372 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374372 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, H04N3/12, H04N5/57 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
G09G3/36 (EP,US);
H04N3/127 (EP,US);
G09G2320/066 (EP,US);
G09G3/3696 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/26] | G09G3/36, H04N3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/26] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeige | [1990/26] | English: | Liquid crystal display device | [1990/26] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 25.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3518433 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]GB2119593 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]EP0261901 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) |