EP0416152 - Finger guard for overhead doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Döring, Erich, Dr.h.c. Im Hölzeli CH-9442 Berneck / CH | [1991/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/11] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89116544.1 | 07.09.1989 | [1991/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416152 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416152 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/48, E06B3/88 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
E06B3/485 (EP);
E06B7/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/11] | Title | German: | Fingerschutzprofil für Sektionaltore | [1991/11] | English: | Finger guard for overhead doors | [1991/11] | French: | Profilé antipince-doigts pour portes sectionnelles | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 04.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7131398U ; | [A]FR1310605 ; | [Y]DE2758824 (HOERMANN BELGIE NV); | [A]FR2461801 (BLANCHON LOUIS); | [A]EP0159058 (ROLKAN NV [BE]); | [A]DE8534153U ; | [Y]US4854365 (JUNEAU PIERRE [CA]) |