EP0359231 - Cordless telephone communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsushima, Kouji 427, Imaiminami-machi Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89116954.2 | 13.09.1989 | [1990/12] | Priority number, date | JP19880229264 | 13.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22926488 | [1990/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0359231 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0359231 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0359231 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/72 | [1990/12] | CPC: |
H04M1/72516 (EP,US);
H04M1/72505 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/16] |
Former [1990/12] | AT, DE, GB, SE | Title | German: | Schnurloses Fernsprechkommunikationssystem | [1990/12] | English: | Cordless telephone communication system | [1990/12] | French: | Système de communication téléphonique sans fil | [1990/12] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 04.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5742240 ; | [A]DE1930533 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG); | [Y]US3962553 (LINDER DONALD L, et al); | [A]DE2731940 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [Y]US4143325 (KAHN LEONARD R); | [A]DE3241185 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0255048 (NEC CORP [JP]) | [A] - MICROELECTRONICS & RELIABILITY vol. 21, no. 2, 1981, OXFORD, UK pages 183 - 189; D. KASPEROVITZ: 'An integrated F.M. receiver ' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 111 (E-114)(989) June 22, 1982 & JP-A-57 42 240 (NIPPON DENKI K.K. ) March 9, 1982, & JP5742240 A 00000000 |