EP0360183 - Deicing and/or antifreeze composition for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrimpf, Hans Sudetenstrasse 3 D-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | 02 /
Krebs, Hans Muehlpfad 69 D-6733 Hassloch / DE | 03 /
Liebold, Gert, Dr. Hundert Morgen 37 D-6803 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | 04 /
Frey, Guenter, Dr. Mainstrasse 13 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | [1990/13] | Application number, filing date | 89117197.7 | 18.09.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | DE19883832310 | 23.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3832310 | [1990/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0360183 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0360183 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0360183 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
C09K3/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1990/13] | Title | German: | Enteisungsmittel bzw. Vereisungsschutzmittel für Flugzeuge | [1990/13] | English: | Deicing and/or antifreeze composition for aircraft | [1990/13] | French: | Moyen de déglage d'antiverglas pour avions | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 25.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.01.1993 | SE | 27.01.1993 | [1993/38] |
Former [1993/32] | SE | 27.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1940825 (GNII GRASDANSKOJ AWIAZII); | [Y]US3940356 (BYRNES PETER G); | [X]EP0050700 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0231869 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0257720 (UNION CARBIDE CANADA LTD [CA]) |