EP0361272 - Optically active esters of 5-ethyl and 5-vinyl 1,3-dioxolane-carboxylic acid, their use as dopants in liquid-crystal mixtures, and liquid-crystal mixtures containing these esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Ingrid, Dr. Am Pfingstbrunnen 1 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Dübal, Hans-Rolf, Dr. Heuhohlweg 6 D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Escher, Claus, Dr. Amselweg 3 D-6109 Mühltal / DE | 04 /
Hemmerling, Wolfgang, Dr. Billtalstrasse 32 D-6231 Sulzbach / DE | 05 /
Illian, Gerhard, Dr. Rauenthaler Weg 32 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 71 / DE | 06 /
Murakami, Mikio Bahnstrasse 2c D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE | 07 /
Ohlendorf, Dieter, Dr. Am Kühlen Grund 4 D-6237 Liederbach / DE | 08 /
Wingen, Rainer, Dr. Rotkäppchenweg 10 D-6234 Hattersheim am Main / DE | [1990/14] | Application number, filing date | 89117265.2 | 19.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19883832503 | 24.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3832503 | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361272 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361272 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, C07D317/30, C07D405/14, C09K19/34, G02F1/13, G09F9/35 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D317/32 (EP,US);
C09K19/3441 (EP,US);
C09K19/3444 (EP,US);
C09K19/3466 (EP,US);
C09K19/3491 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Optische aktive Ester der 5-Ethyl- und der 5-Vinyl-1,3-dioxolan-4-carbonsäure, ihre Verwendung als Dotierstoffe in Flüssigkristallmischungen und die Ester enthaltende Flüssigkristallmischungen | [1994/22] | English: | Optically active esters of 5-ethyl and 5-vinyl 1,3-dioxolane-carboxylic acid, their use as dopants in liquid-crystal mixtures, and liquid-crystal mixtures containing these esters | [1990/14] | French: | Esters optiquement actifs de l'acide éthyl-5 et vinyl-5 dioxolanne-1,3 carboxylique-4, leur utilisation comme agents de dopage dans des mélanges de cristaux liquides et mélanges de cristaux liquides cntenant ces esters | [1990/14] |
Former [1990/14] | Neue optische aktive Ester der 5-Ethyl- und der 5-Vinyl-1,3-dioxolan-4-carbonsäure, ihre Verwendung als Dotierstoffe in Flüssigkristallmischungen und die neuen Ester enthaltende Flüssigkristallmischungen | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.06.1994 | FR | 01.06.1994 | GB | 01.06.1994 | IT | 01.06.1994 | NL | 01.06.1994 | SE | 01.09.1994 | AT | 19.09.1994 | CH | 30.09.1994 | LI | 30.09.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
GB | 01.06.1994 | ||
IT | 01.06.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
AT | 19.09.1994 | ||
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
FR | 28.10.1994 | ||
Former [1996/14] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
GB | 01.06.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
AT | 19.09.1994 | ||
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
FR | 28.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/32] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
GB | 01.06.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
FR | 28.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/24] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
GB | 01.06.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
FR | 28.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
GB | 01.06.1994 | ||
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
NL | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/05] | SE | 01.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3604898 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [XPD]DE3713273 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0307880 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 110, Nr. 20, 25. Mai 1989, Columbus, Ohio, USA DUEBAL et al. "Three classes of new chiral dopants: synthesis and physical qualification as dopants for practical ferroelectric liquid crystal mixtures" Seite 709, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassung-Nr. 183 512a |