EP0361280 - Metallisable biaxially oriented sheet of polypropylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bothe, Lothar, Dr. Am Heiligenhaus 9 D-6500 Mainz-Gonsenheim / DE | 02 /
Schlögl, Gunter, Dr. Finkenweg 2 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | [1990/14] | Application number, filing date | 89117289.2 | 19.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | DE19883832880 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: DE 3832880 | [1990/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361280 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361280 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, B32B27/32, B32B27/20 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
B32B2255/10 (US);
B32B2255/205 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2311/24 (US);
B32B2323/04 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31692 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/14] | Title | German: | Biaxial orientierte Polypropylenfolie für die Metallisieranwendung | [1990/14] | English: | Metallisable biaxially oriented sheet of polypropylene | [1990/14] | French: | Feuille en polypropylène biaxiallement orientée et métallisable | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0021672 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [X]US4604322 (REID DONALD E [US]); | [AD]DE3701307 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]EP0282917 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |