EP0361297 - Image pickup system capable of obtaining a plurality of stereo images with different base height ratios [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Naoshi c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89117376.7 | 20.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | JP19880237073 | 20.09.1988 Original published format: JP 23707388 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361297 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/02, H04N3/14, G01C11/02 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
G01C11/02 (EP,US);
H04N13/218 (EP,US);
H04N13/221 (EP,US);
H04N13/296 (EP,US);
H04N13/10 (EP,US);
H04N13/167 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/14] | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmesystem zur Erzeugung einer Vielzahl von Stereobildern mit verschiedenen Basis/Höhen-Verhältnissen | [1990/14] | English: | Image pickup system capable of obtaining a plurality of stereo images with different base height ratios | [1990/14] | French: | Système de prise de vues pour la génération d'une pluralité d'images stéréoscopiques avec rapports de base/altitude différents | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/14] | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1997/35] | 13.11.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.04.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/35] | Appeal following examination | 17.01.1996 | Appeal received No. T0412/96 | 18.03.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.04.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 24.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4613899 (KUWANO RYUSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]DE2812323 (AEROSPATIALE); | [Y]EP0037530 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) |