EP0374384 - Single-pressure switch with SF6 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 60596 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karrenbauer, Herbert, Dr.-Ing. Amselweg 4 D-3501 Niestetal/Kassel / DE | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/49] | Erbacher, Alfons, Dipl.-Ing., et al Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | Lertes, Kurt, Dr. Licentia Patent-Verwaltungs-GmbH Theodor-Stern-Kai 1 D-60596 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 89117724.8 | 26.09.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | DE19883843406 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843406 | [1990/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0374384 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0374384 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374384 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/90 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
H01H33/901 (EP);
H01H2033/908 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | SF6-Eindruckschalter | [1990/26] | English: | Single-pressure switch with SF6 | [1990/26] | French: | Interrupteur monopression à SF6 | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2575323 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]); | [A]DE3132825 (SPRECHER & SCHUH AG [CH]); | [A]EP0239068 (ALSTHOM [FR]); | [A]CH568649 (SPRECHER & SCHUH AG) |