EP0364774 - Slow gel/cure systems based on dialkylzinc for dicyclopentadiene polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bell, Andrew (NMN) 10 Worthington Drive West Grove Pennsylvania 19390 / US | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89117855.0 | 27.09.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | US19880250209 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: US 250209 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364774 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364774 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
C08F4/00 (KR);
C08G61/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Träges Gel- oder Härtersystem auf der Basis von Dialkylzink, für die Polymerisation von Dicyclopentadien | [1990/17] | English: | Slow gel/cure systems based on dialkylzinc for dicyclopentadiene polymerization | [1990/17] | French: | Système lent de gélification et de durcissement pour polymériser le dicyclopentadiène, à base de dialkylzinc | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 14.09.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4727125 (NELSON LAWRENCE L [US]); | [Y]DE2526090 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]DE2442181 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]US3859265 (HEPWORTH PAUL); | [A]US3520856 (ASTA GINO DALL); | [A]BE676311 | [Y] - INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 14, no. 4, 1975, pages 951-953; E.L. MUETTERTIES: "Mechanism for the Olefin metathesis reaction" |