EP0367969 - Vane segment support and alignment arrangement for a combustion turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McLaurin, Leroy Dixon 1727 Seneca Boulevard Winter Springs, FL 32708 / US | 02 /
Williams, Roland E. 524-202 Via Verona Lane Altamonte Springs, FL 32714 / US | 03 /
Donlan, John Paul 2357 Westminster Terrace Oviedo, FL 32765 / US | 04 /
Hultgren, Kent Goran 506 School Lane Swarthmore, PA 19081 / US | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89117886.5 | 27.09.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | US19880259811 | 19.10.1988 Original published format: US 259811 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367969 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367969 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
F01D9/04 (EP,US);
F01D9/02 (KR);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F05B2230/608 (US);
F05D2230/644 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Halterung und Zentrierungseinrichtung für Leitschaufelträger einer Gasturbine | [1990/20] | English: | Vane segment support and alignment arrangement for a combustion turbine | [1990/20] | French: | Dispositif de fixation et alignement de secteur de distributeur de turbine à gaz | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 01.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 03.06.1992 | NL | 03.06.1992 | SE | 03.06.1992 | [1993/13] |
Former [1993/03] | NL | 03.06.1992 | |
SE | 03.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2942844 (NEATE ELROY P); | [A]US2971333 (PAUL MENDELSOHN JULIAN, et al); | [A]US3070352 (WELSH HARVEY W); | [A]DE1178253 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [A]CH491288 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]DE2165529 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]US4127357 (PATTERSON WILLIAM R); | [A]GB2042646 (ROLLS ROYCE) |