EP0361468 - A kit for the detection of denatured lipoproteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN IMMUNO RESEARCH LABORATORIES CO., LTD. 17-5, Sakae-cho Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken 370 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states JAPAN IMMUNO RESEARCH LABORATORIES CO., LTD. 17-5, Sakae-cho Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken 370 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Masakazu 3493-9, Ishihara-machi Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Saitou, Toshimitu 1928-340, Oaza Munataka Gunma-cho Gunma-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Murata, Kimiyo B-101, 239-7, Fujizuka-machi Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Tamura, Aki 2-9-6, Ohtone-cho Maebashi-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89117937.6 | 28.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | JP19880244987 | 29.09.1988 Original published format: JP 24498788 | JP19890231893 | 06.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23189389 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361468 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361468 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/92, G01N33/68, G01N33/577, G01N33/538 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/92 (EP);
G01N2800/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/14] | Title | German: | Testsatz zum Nachweis von denaturierten Lipoproteinen | [1990/14] | English: | A kit for the detection of denatured lipoproteins | [1990/14] | French: | Nécessaire de test pour la détection de lipoprotéines dénaturées | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/35] | 16.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0257778 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 13, March 28, 1988, Columbus, Ohio, USA T.SAITO et al. "Study on metabolism of lipoproteins using selected-affinity columns with monoclonal antibodies. II. Analysis of components in apo A-I and B-100 particles" page 325, Abstract-no. 109 122r | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 17, October 26, 1987, Columbus, Ohio, USA S.KSAHARA et al. "Metabolism of lipoproteins using selected-affinity columns with monoclonal antibodies. I. Isolation of apolipopro- tein A-I and apolipoprotein B-100 containing particles from human plasma" page 360, Abstract-no. 150 520m | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 106, no. 26, June 29, 1987, Columbus, Ohio, USA T.MORI et al. "Monoclonal antibodies to human lipo- protein A-I and their use in affinity chromatography of the arteriosclerosis prevention factor" page 375, Abstract-no. 219 579m & Jpn. Kokai Tokkyo Koho JP 62 58, 997 (87 58,997) | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 13, March 28, 1988, Columbus, OH (US); T.SAITO et al., p. 325, no. 109122r* | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 17, October 26, 1987, Columbus, OH (US); S.KSAHARA et al., p. 360, no. 150520m* | by applicant | - MED. CLIN. NORTH AM., (1974), vol. 58, pages 363 - 379 | - ARTERIAL SCLEROSIS, (1986), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 931 - 936 | - HUI, D. Y.; INNERARITY, T. L.; MAHLEY, R. W., J. BIO. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, pages 860 - 869 | - GONEN ET AL., DIABETES, (1981), vol. 30, page 875 |