EP0419708 - Interface module for a bus interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flach, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Pfistermeisterstrasse 47 D-8450 Amberg / DE | [1991/14] | Application number, filing date | 89117940.0 | 28.09.1989 | [1991/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419708 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419708 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/40 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
H04L12/40032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Schnittstellenbaustein für eine Busschnittstelle | [1991/14] | English: | Interface module for a bus interface | [1991/14] | French: | Module d'interface pour une interface de ligne bus | [1994/48] |
Former [1991/14] | Module d'interface pour un interface de ligne bus | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0163361 (MOLEX INC [US]) | [AD] - ELEKTRONIK. vol. 35, no. 19, 19 September 1986, MUNCHEN DE Seiten 146 - 154; R. WILSON: "HOCHLEISTUNGSNETZE FUER PERIPHERIEGERAETE Aufbau von SCSI- und IPI-Schnittstellen mit RS-485 transceivern " | [A] - ELEKTRONIK. vol. 36, no. 13, 26 Juni 1987, MUNCHEN DE Seiten 86 - 94; A. Djenguerian: "PRAKTISCHER AUFBAU EINES ETHERNET-/CHEAPERNET-ANSCHLUSSKNOTENS" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 24, no. 8, Januar 1982, NEW YORK US Seiten 4041 - 4042; R. KELLER et al.: "LOCAL ATTACHMENT OF A STATION TO A RING NETWORK THROUGH A DISTRIBUTION PANEL AND A COAXIAL CABLE " |