EP0362712 - Applicator for dispensing fluidic substances onto the skin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lichtwer Pharma GmbH Drewitzer Strasse 10 D-13467 Berlin / DE | [1992/35] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states INNTAL-APOTHEKE Dr. Jürgen Rohmeder Erhartinger Strasse 9 D-8266 Töging/Inn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohmeder, Jürgen, Dr. Erhartinger Strasse 9 W-8266 Töging/Inn / DE | [1992/30] |
Former [1990/15] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Maikowski, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Maikowski, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Xantener Strasse 10 D-10707 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1990/15] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118075.4 | 29.09.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | DE19880012344U | 29.09.1988 Original published format: DE 8812344 U | [1990/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0362712 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0362712 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362712 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M35/00 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
A45D34/045 (EP,US);
A61M35/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | Applikator zum Auftragen von flüssigen Mitteln auf die Haut | [1990/15] | English: | Applicator for dispensing fluidic substances onto the skin | [1990/15] | French: | Applicateur pour distribuer les produits liquides sur la peau | [1990/15] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 08.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.04.1993 | ES | 21.04.1993 | FR | 21.04.1993 | GB | 21.04.1993 | GR | 21.04.1993 | IT | 21.04.1993 | NL | 21.04.1993 | SE | 21.04.1993 | AT | 29.09.1993 | CH | 30.09.1993 | LI | 30.09.1993 | LU | 30.09.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
ES | 21.04.1993 | ||
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
GR | 21.04.1993 | ||
IT | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
FR | 10.09.1993 | ||
AT | 29.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
LU | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
GR | 21.04.1993 | ||
IT | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
FR | 10.09.1993 | ||
AT | 29.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
LU | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
IT | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
FR | 10.09.1993 | ||
AT | 29.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1995/15] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
FR | 10.09.1993 | ||
AT | 29.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
FR | 10.09.1993 | ||
CH | 30.09.1993 | ||
LI | 30.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
FR | 10.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
GB | 21.04.1993 | ||
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | BE | 21.04.1993 | |
NL | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | BE | 21.04.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU562341B ; | [X]CH217080 (SZUECS LADISLAUS [CH]); | [A]FR984176 (REVELITH); | [A]FR85853E ; | [AD]DE8510160U |