EP0362735 - Unsaturated group-containing polycarboxylic acid resin, resin composition and solder resist resin composition comprising the same and cured product thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0071 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nawata, Kazuyoshi 173-4, Oaza Higashi-Takatomari Onoda-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ohkubo, Tetsuo 92, Oaza Nakano-Kaisaku Ube-shi Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yokoshima, Minoru 2291, Ino Toride-shi Ibaragi-ken / JP | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118153.9 | 30.09.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | JP19880250682 | 04.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25068288 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0362735 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0362735 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362735 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/17, C08G59/32, C08G59/42, B23K35/22 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
C08L63/10 (EP,US);
C08G59/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08F299/02 (KR);
C08F299/026 (EP,US);
C08G59/1466 (EP,KR,US);
C08G59/3218 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/15] | Title | German: | Ungesättigte Gruppen enthaltendes Polycarboxylsäureharz, Harzzusammensetzung und lötbeständige Harzzusammensetzung auf der Basis dieses Harzes und daraus hergestelltes gehärtetes Produkt | [1990/15] | English: | Unsaturated group-containing polycarboxylic acid resin, resin composition and solder resist resin composition comprising the same and cured product thereof | [1990/15] | French: | Résine d'acide polycarboxylique contenant des groupes insaturés, composition de résine, composition de résine pour masque de soudure la contenant, et produit réticulé de ladite résine | [1990/15] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2317331 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) | Examination | EP0273729 |