EP0363792 - Melanin production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOSOURCE GENETICS CORPORATION 3333 Vaca Valley Parkway Vacaville, CA 95688 / US | [1990/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grill, Laurence K. 3570 Cantelow Road Vacaville, California 95688 / US | 02 /
Garger, Stephen J., Jr. 593 Cottonwood Street Vacaville, California 95688 / US | 03 /
Sverlow, Genadie D. 851 Malibu Drive Concord, California 94518 / US | 04 /
Erwin, Robert L. 336 Summerfield Drive Vacaville, California 95687 / US | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/16] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 02 47 D-80059 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118346.9 | 03.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | US19880251809 | 03.10.1988 Original published format: US 251809 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0363792 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0363792 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P17/16, C12P1/00, C12N15/53 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
C12N9/0059 (EP);
C12N15/52 (KR);
C07K14/36 (EP);
C12N9/0071 (EP);
C12P17/00 (EP);
C12Y114/18001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/16] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Melanin | [1990/16] | English: | Melanin production | [1990/16] | French: | Production de mélanine | [1990/16] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]PL114875 ; | [A]WO8802372 (GUTHRIE DONALD FOUND MED RES [US]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 1, 3rd January 1983, page 325, abstract no. 3561t, Columbus, Ohio, US; & PL-A-114 875 (Akademia Rolnicza, Krakow) 30-09-1982, & PL114875 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 15, 11th April 1988, page 417, abstract no. 128189j, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. PLATEN et al.: "Effect of copper on growth and tyrosinase activity of streptomycetes", & VDLUFA-Schriftenr. 1987, 20(Leistungsfoerderer Tierprod.), 859-69 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 19, 19th November 1981, page 379, abstract no. 165240c, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.V. PAVLENKO et al.: "Melanin pigment of Gluconobacter oxydans", & MIKROBIOLOGIYA 1981, 50(4), 718-22 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 15, 9th October 1978, page 294, abstract no. 125900n, Columbus, Ohio, US; F. GULYAS: "Studies of pigment formation by Actinomycetes", & SOIL BIOL. CONSERV. BIOSPHERE, [PROC. MEET.], 7th 1975 (Pub. 1977), 265-70 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, no. 1, 5th January 1970, page 78, abstract no. 878d, Columbus, Ohio, US; S.J. PIRT et al.: "Melanin production in Aspergillus nidulans", & BIOCHEM. J. 1969, 114(1), 9P-10P | [Y] - TRANS. MYCOL. SOC. Vol 70(3) 1978 p 453-455 B.I. ROWLEY et al: "Influence of growth rate history on production of melanin by Aspergillus Nidulans" | [A] - JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, Vol 129, 1983, p 2703-2714 E. KATZ et al: "Cloning and Expression of the tyrosinase gene from Streptomyces antibioticus in Streptomyces lividans" | Examination | - 20(Leistungsfoerderer Tierprod.), 859-69 | - J. Clin. Microbiol., Vol. 10 (5), 1979, pp. 724-729 |