EP0367985 - Nozzle attachment for an adhesive spray gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, OH 44145 / US | [1990/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scholl, Charles H. 3699 Hermitage Drive Duluth Georgia 30136 / US | [1990/20] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/20] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118357.6 | 04.10.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | US19880268002 | 07.11.1988 Original published format: US 268002 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367985 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367985 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367985 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/16, B05C5/04 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
B05B7/0861 (EP);
B05C5/02 (EP);
B05C5/0225 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/20] | B05C5/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/20] | Title | German: | Düsenvorsatz für eine Klebepistole | [1990/20] | English: | Nozzle attachment for an adhesive spray gun | [1990/20] | French: | Adaptateur d'une tuyère pour un pistolet à adhésif | [1990/20] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.1995
06.11.1995
ADMISSIBLE ITW Dynatec GmbH Klebetechnik Max-Planck-Strasse 15 D-40699 Erkrath / DE Opponent's representative Palgen, Peter Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.10.1995
06.11.1995
ADMISSIBLE ITW Dynatec GmbH Klebetechnik Max-Planck-Strasse 15 D-40699 Erkrath / DE Opponent's representative Palgen, Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Peter Palgen, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Schumacher, Mulvanystrasse 2 D-40239 Düsseldorf / DE | 11.12.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.05.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.05.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.02.1995 | ES | 01.02.1995 | FR | 01.02.1995 | NL | 01.02.1995 | SE | 01.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 01.02.1995 | |
ES | 01.02.1995 | ||
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
SE | 01.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 01.02.1995 | |
NL | 01.02.1995 | ||
SE | 01.05.1995 | ||
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | NL | 01.02.1995 | |
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | FR | 30.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0333902 ; | [Y]GB1587898 ; | [A]WO8101670 ; | [A]EP0222379 ; | [A]DE2553664 ; | [AD]US3152923 ; | [AD]US4185981 |