EP0366959 - Method and device for wrapping or enveloping bodies, especially coil bobbins provided with electric windings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirschmann, Gregory C. Rautistrasse 12 CH-8047 Zürich / CH | [1990/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 89118374.1 | 04.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | CH19880004053 | 31.10.1988 Original published format: CH 405388 | [1990/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0366959 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/12, B65H23/032 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
B65H23/0328 (EP,US);
H01F41/125 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1378 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum Bandagieren oder Umwickeln von Körpern, insbesondere von mit elektrischen Wicklungen versehenen Spulenkörpern | [1990/19] | English: | Method and device for wrapping or enveloping bodies, especially coil bobbins provided with electric windings | [1990/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour enrubanner ou envelopper des corps, en particulier des corps de bobine munis d'enroulements électriques | [1990/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/34] | 26.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1362262 (ERHARDT & LEIMER OHG); | [A]US3253794 (TWIGG ROBERT W); | [A]US4148677 (BELLAMY WILLIAM G, et al); | [A]DE3139498 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0105426 (STICHT FERTIGUNGSTECH STIWA [AT]); | [A]DE3516763 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |