EP0363812 - Method and installation for generating steam, especially in heat power plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HANNOVER-BRAUNSCHWEIGISCHE STROM-VERSORGUNGS-AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Humboldtstrasse 33 D-30169 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states HANNOVER-BRAUNSCHWEIGISCHE STROM-VERSORGUNGS-AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Humboldtstrasse 33 D-30169 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schinkel, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Bispinger Weg 12A D-3000 Hannover 61 / DE | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Stasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1990/16] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 73 04 66, Grubesallee 26 D-22124 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118445.9 | 04.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | DE19883834801 | 10.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3834801 | [1990/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0363812 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0363812 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F23C11/02 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
F23C10/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Dampferzeugung, insbesondere in Heizkraftwerken | [1990/16] | English: | Method and installation for generating steam, especially in heat power plants | [1990/16] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la génération de vapeur dans une centrale de cogénération de puissance et de chaleur | [1990/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 18.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59167608 ; | [A]JP5981408 ; | [A]JP61173012 ; | [Y]US4308810 ; | [Y]GB2192141 ; | [A]US4543894 ; | [A]GB2023268 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 22 (M-354)[1745], 30. Januar 1985; & JP-A-59 167 608 (BABCOCK) 21-09-1984, & JP59167608 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 191 (M-322)[1628], 4. September 1984; & JP-A-59 81 408 (BABCOCK) 11-05-1984, & JP5981408 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 381 (M-547)[2438], 19. Dezember 1986; & JP-A-61 173 012 (HITACHI) 04-08-1986, & JP61173012 A 00000000 |