EP0370212 - Nut with a pressure ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erich Neumayer GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Zangen-Strasse 9 77756 Hausach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | For all designated states Erich Neumayer GmbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Zangen-Strasse 9 D-77756 Hausach / DE | ||
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states Erich Neumayer Beteiligungs- und Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH & Co. KG Wilhelm-Zangen-Strasse 9 D-77756 Hausach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1995/21] |
Former [1990/22] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/22] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118494.7 | 05.10.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | DE19880013513U | 27.10.1988 Original published format: DE 8813513 U | [1990/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0370212 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0370212 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16B43/00, F16B39/26 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
F16B43/00 (EP,US);
F16B41/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/01] |
Former [1991/46] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | ||
Former [1990/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Mutter mit Druckring | [1990/22] | English: | Nut with a pressure ring | [1990/22] | French: | Ecrou avec anneau de serrage | [1990/22] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/21: Teilanmeldung 94117946.7 eingereicht am 05/10/89 | EPB 1995/21: Divisional application 94117946.7 filed on 05/10/89 | EPB 1995/21: Demande divisionnaire 94117946.7 déposée le 05/10/89 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DE, GR, LU | 01.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94117946.7 / EP0643232 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.11.1989 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.1989 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   22.12.1989 | 21.11.1989 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.1989 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.11.1989 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 24.05.1995 | ES | 24.05.1995 | GB | 24.05.1995 | IT | 24.05.1995 | NL | 24.05.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 24.05.1995 | |
ES | 24.05.1995 | ||
GB | 24.05.1995 | ||
IT | 24.05.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 24.05.1995 | |
GB | 24.05.1995 | ||
IT | 24.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | BE | 24.05.1995 | |
GB | 24.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/05] | BE | 24.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1144484 (MICHELIN & CIE); | [A]LU57109 ; | [A]FR1162040 |