EP0362849 - Method and system for fitting image positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/15] | Method and system for fitting image system | ||
[1996/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujiwara, Sigemi c/o Intellectual Property Div. KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/15] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118507.6 | 05.10.1989 | [1990/15] | Priority number, date | JP19880252977 | 07.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25297788 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0362849 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0362849 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362849 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/50 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
G06T3/14 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T7/254 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/15] | G06F15/68 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1990/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Berichtigung von Stellungen von Bildern | [1996/50] | English: | Method and system for fitting image positions | [1996/50] | French: | Méthode et système pour ajuster des positions d'images | [1996/50] |
Former [1990/15] | Verfahren und Anlage zur Berichtigung von Stellungen | ||
Former [1990/15] | Method and system for fitting image system | ||
Former [1990/15] | Méthode et système pour ajuster des positions | Examination procedure | 05.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP02041077 ; | [A]JP58099082 ; | [A]JP59080085 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 200 (E-920)[4143], 24th April 1990; & JP-A-02 041 077 (SHIMADZU) 09-02-1990, & JP02041077 A 00000000 | [A] - §§TENT ABSTACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 200 (E-196)[1345], 3rd September 1983; & JP-A-58 099 082 (HTACHI) 13-06-1983, & JP58099082 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 190 (E-263)[1627], 31st August 1984; & JP-A-59 080 085 (SHIMAZU) 09-05-1984, & JP59080085 A 00000000 | Examination | JP5899082 | - PATENT ABSTACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 200 (E-196)[1345], 3rd September 1983; & JP-A-58 99 082 (HTACHI) 13-06-1983, & JP5899082 A 00000000 |