Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0362887


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.08.2008 Change - representative published on  17.09.2008  [2008/38]
06.09.1994 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  26.10.1994 [1994/43]
04.08.1993 Change - applicant published on  22.09.1993 [1993/38]
10.02.1993 First examination report
26.11.1991 Change - designated states published on  15.01.1992 [1992/03]
11.04.1991 Publication of search report published on  29.05.1991 [1991/22]
18.01.1991 Request for examination filed published on  06.03.1991 [1991/10]
24.02.1990 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.04.1990 [1990/15]