blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0362887

EP0362887 - Brake control apparatus for bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.1994
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsucho 3-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/38]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, Oimatsucho 3-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
Former [1990/15]For all designated states
SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL COMPANY LIMITED
77, Oimatsucho 3 cho Sakai
Osaka 590 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagano, Masashi
74-19, Midorigaoka
Izumi-shi Osaka / JP
[1990/15]
Representative(s)Säger, Manfred
Säger & Hofmann Patent AG
Feldgüetliweg 130
8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Säger, Manfred
Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5
7304 Maienfeld / CH
Former [1990/15]Säger, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Säger & Partner Postfach 81 08 09
D-81908 München / DE
Application number, filing date89118624.906.10.1989
[1990/15]
Priority number, dateJP19880132123U07.10.1988         Original published format: JP 13212388 U
[1990/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0362887
Date:11.04.1990
Language:EN
[1990/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0362887
Date:29.05.1991
Language:EN
[1991/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.1991
ClassificationIPC:B62L3/02
[1990/15]
CPC:
B62L3/02 (EP,US); Y10T74/20287 (EP,US); Y10T74/20438 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1992/03]
Former [1990/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bremssteuervorrichtung für Fahrrad[1990/15]
English:Brake control apparatus for bicycle[1990/15]
French:Dispositif de commande de frein pour bicyclette[1990/15]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure07.11.1989Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
01.02.1990Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, ES, GB, GR, LU, NL, SE
02.01.1991Examination requested  [1991/10]
15.02.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.1993Fee for grant paid
29.06.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.05.1994Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1994/43]
01.06.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1994/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.12.1989AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989GB   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.12.1989SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199103   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.1991
31.10.199305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2597824  (SHIMANO INDUSTRIAL CO [JP]);
 [A]US4735106  (YOSHIGAI TOSHIHARU [JP]);
 [A]BE419481  ;
 [A]FR1141954
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.