blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0372196

EP0372196 - Fastening system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.12.1992
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2009Change - applicantpublished on 09.12.2009  [2009/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
[2009/50]
Former [1990/24]For all designated states
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co. KG
Weinhalde 14 - 18
D-72178 Waldachtal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mayer, Burkhard
Altdorfer Strasse 37
D-7038 Holzgerlingen / DE
02 / Heizmann, Hans Peter
Frühlingsstrasse 10
D-7298 Lossburg 1 / DE
[1990/24]
Representative(s)Ott, Elmar
Fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co KG
Weinhalde 14-18
72178 Waldachtal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/24]Ott, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing.
fischerwerke Artur Fischer GmbH & Co KG Weinhalde 14-18
D-72178 Waldachtal / DE
Application number, filing date89118746.009.10.1989
[1990/24]
Priority number, dateDE1988384091405.12.1988         Original published format: DE 3840914
[1990/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0372196
Date:13.06.1990
Language:DE
[1990/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0372196
Date:03.10.1990
Language:DE
[1990/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0372196
Date:26.02.1992
Language:DE
[1992/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.1990
ClassificationIPC:F16B13/06, B25B21/00
[1990/24]
CPC:
F16B13/065 (EP); B25B31/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1990/24]
TitleGerman:Befestigungssystem[1990/24]
English:Fastening system[1990/24]
French:Système de fixation[1990/24]
Examination procedure29.08.1990Examination requested  [1990/43]
31.07.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.08.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1991Fee for grant paid
24.10.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.11.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2221267  (FEIGE GIORGIO);
 [A]DE2935964  (FISCHER ARTUR DR H C)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.