EP0422263 - High precision positive transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/16] | Positive drive | ||
[1995/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hofmann, Detlef Postfach 835 D-75108 Pforzheim / DE | [1991/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Trappenberg, Hans Trappenberg u. Dimmerling, Postfach 21 13 75 76163 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Trappenberg, Hans Trappenberg u. Dimmerling, Postfach 21 13 75 D-76163 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118762.7 | 10.10.1989 | [1991/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422263 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0422263 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H49/00, B23Q16/02, B23Q16/06 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
F16H49/001 (EP);
B23Q16/021 (EP);
F16H2049/008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/16] | F16H49/00, B23Q16/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | Präzisions-Koppelgetriebe | [1991/16] | English: | High precision positive transmission | [1995/13] | French: | Transmission positive à haute précision | [1995/13] |
Former [1991/16] | Positive drive | ||
Former [1991/16] | Entraînement positif | Examination procedure | 09.02.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 27.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 02.06.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 19.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1993 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2959065 (WALTON MUSSER C); | [X]GB983721 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD); | [X]DE2243722 (DICKERTMANN HEBEZEUGFAB AG); | [Y]US3842947 (HOFMANN D); | [X]AU461555B ; | [A]US4189961 (KABURAGI HISASHI [JP], et al); | [Y]DE3136552 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]); | [A]JPS59140937 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [X]JPS59170549 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4552037 (DISTIN JR ROBERT G [US], et al) | by applicant | US3714848 | US3842947 | JPS59170549 |