Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1994 [1994/21] |
08.04.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] |
10.09.1991 | First examination report | |
15.05.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] |
13.04.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] |