Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0370218 | Global Dossier | 26.05.1993 | B1 | EP0370218 | 30.05.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3839449 | 23.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3839449 | 31.05.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3839449 | 23.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58904491D1 | 01.07.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3839449 | 23.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0432206B | 28.05.1992 | B2 | JPH02181012 | 13.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3839449 | 23.11.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5036811 | 06.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3839449 | 23.11.1988 |