blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0372197

EP0372197 - Device for the acquisition of an axle load signal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.1993 [1993/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH
Am Lindener Hafen 21
30453 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/24]For all designated states
WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH
Am Lindener Hafen 21
D-30453 Hannover / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eckert, Horst
Marienhöhe 2
D-3056 Rehburg-Loccum 3 / DE
[1990/24]
Representative(s)Schrödter, Manfred
WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62
30432 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/24]Schrödter, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
WABCO Westinghouse Fahrzeugbremsen GmbH Postfach 91 12 80
D-30432 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date89118845.011.10.1989
[1990/24]
Priority number, dateDE1989392029021.06.1989         Original published format: DE 3920290
DE1988384083803.12.1988         Original published format: DE 3840838
[1990/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0372197
Date:13.06.1990
Language:DE
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0372197
Date:01.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:B60T8/18, B62D61/12
[1990/24]
CPC:
B60T8/3205 (EP); B60G17/0565 (EP); B60T8/1837 (EP);
B62D61/125 (EP); B60G2202/152 (EP); B60G2204/11 (EP);
B60G2204/80 (EP); B60G2300/40 (EP); B60G2400/252 (EP);
B60G2400/51222 (EP); B60G2400/61 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1990/24]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Gewinnung eines Achslastsignals[1990/24]
English:Device for the acquisition of an axle load signal[1990/24]
French:Dispositif d'acquisition d'un signal de charge d'un essieu[1990/24]
Examination procedure16.05.1990Examination requested  [1990/28]
11.07.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.09.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.10.1991Fee for grant paid
17.10.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2550503  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]US2934351  (MASSER LLOYD D);
 [A]DE3216407  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]);
 [A]DE3330618  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]);
 [A]FR2115388  (BOSCH);
 [A]CH529642  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]EP0275845  (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]);
 [A]FR1261813  (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA);
 [A]GB2184803  (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA);
 [A]FR2121677  (SAAB SCANIA AB);
 [A]DE3324401  (SAAB SCANIA AB [SE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.