EP0365930 - Random number generator circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Raymond A. 8317 Morningside Drive Manassas VA 22111 / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Rach, Werner, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/51] | Rach, Werner, Dr., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/37] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1990/18] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 89118953.2 | 12.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880264467 | 28.10.1988 Original published format: US 264467 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0365930 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0365930 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/58 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
G06F7/584 (EP,US);
G06F7/588 (EP,US);
H03K3/84 (EP,US);
G06F2207/581 (EP,US);
G06F2207/583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/18] | Title | German: | Zufallszahlenerzeugungsschaltung | [1990/18] | English: | Random number generator circuit | [1990/18] | French: | Circuit de génération de nombres aléatoires | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 10.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/44] | 03.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1996 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4769777 (BITTLE WILLIAM D [US], et al); | [A]DE2649502 (GUENTER WULFF APPBAU GMBH) |