EP0364881 - Process for preparing granules containing surface-active agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilms, Elmar, Dr. Melanderstrasse 22 D-4057 Dormagen / DE | [1990/17] | Application number, filing date | 89118962.3 | 12.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | DE19883835918 | 21.10.1988 Original published format: DE 3835918 | [1990/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364881 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364881 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/72 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
C11D17/06 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,KR,US);
C11D17/065 (EP,US);
C11D3/126 (EP,US);
C11D3/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GR [1990/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von tensidhaltigen Granulaten | [1990/17] | English: | Process for preparing granules containing surface-active agents | [1990/17] | French: | Préparation de granulés contenant des agents tensio-actifs | [1990/17] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/32: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 89911804.6/0536110 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 22.06.93 | EPB 1993/32: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 89911804.6/0536110 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 22.06.93 | EPB 1993/32: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 89911804.6/0536110 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 22.06.93 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2369341 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON [GB]); | [A]DE2837504 (HENKEL KGAA); | [A]EP0028432 | by applicant | DE2334899 | DE2412837 | DE2527388 | EP0026529 | DE3206265 | EP0149264 | DE3444960 | DE3526405 |