Cited in | Search | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP63108767
[A] ; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP59161063
[A] ; | Type: | Patent literature | Publication No.: | JP59145568
[A] | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 351 (E-660)(3198) 20 September 1988, & JP-A-63 108767 (NEC) 13 May 1988,, & JP63108767 A 19880513 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 10 (E-290)(1733) 17 January 1985, & JP-A-59 161063 (HITACHI) 11 September 1984,, & JP59161063 A 19840911 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 277 (E-285)(1714) 18 December 1984, & JP-A-59 145568 (HITACHI) 21 August 1984,, & JP59145568 A 19840821 |