Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0363973 | Global Dossier | 16.01.1991 | A3 | EP0363973 | 18.04.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP25848188 | 14.10.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0828423B | 21.03.1996 | B2 | JPH02105567 | 18.04.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25848188 | 14.10.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5016075 | 14.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25848188 | 14.10.1988 |