EP0363978 - Resist composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uetani, Yasunori 4-9-17, Sakuragaoka Minoo-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Hanabata, Makoto 1-147, Asahigaoka Inagawa-cho Kawabe-gun Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakanishi, Hirotoshi 1-8-14, Yamazaki Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Kuwana, Koji 5-3-16, Hayashi Fujiidera-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Oi, Fumio 3-1-506, Hamaashiya-cho Ashiya-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89119055.5 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | JP19880258937 | 13.10.1988 Original published format: JP 25893788 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0363978 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0363978 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/022 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
G03F7/0226 (EP,US);
G03F7/022 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/16] | Title | German: | Schutzlack-Zusammensetzung | [1990/16] | English: | Resist composition | [1990/16] | French: | Composition formant réserve | [1990/16] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 09.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/43] | 28.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61257525 ; | [X]JP60121445 ; | [X]JP58150948 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 359 (P-762)(3206) 27 September 1988, & JP-A-61 257525 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) 14 May 1988,, & JP61257525 A 19880514 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 276 (P-402)(1999) 02 November 1985, & JP-A-60 121445 (NIPPON GOSEI GOMU KK) 28 June 1985,, & JP60121445 A 19850628 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 270 (P-240)(1415) 02 December 1983, & JP-A-58 150948 (DAINIPPON INK KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 07 September 1983,, & JP58150948 A 19830907 |