EP0364930 - Negative impedance driving apparatus having temperature compensation circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noro, Masao c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1,Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Daisuke c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1,Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/17] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89119188.4 | 16.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | JP19880134511 | 17.10.1988 Original published format: JP 13451188 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364930 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364930 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/00 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
H03F1/56 (EP,US);
H03F3/181 (EP,US);
H04R3/002 (EP,US);
H04R3/007 (EP,US);
H03F2200/03 (EP,US);
H03F2200/369 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Negativ-Impedanz-Antriebsvorrichtung unit temperaturkompensierter Schaltung | [1990/17] | English: | Negative impedance driving apparatus having temperature compensation circuit | [1990/17] | French: | Appareil de commande à impédance négative avec circuit de compensation de température | [1990/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/17] | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/30] | Request for further processing for: | 11.11.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.12.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6014598 ; | [A]US3525812 (VERDIER JAMES E); | [A]DE2631792 (BRAUN AG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 126 (E-318)[1849], 31st May 1985; & JP-A-60 14 598 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 25-01-1985, & JP6014598 A 00000000 |