EP0364995 - Cell having current cutoff valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oishi, Shigeru c/o Sony Energytec Inc. 1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-cho Koriyama Fukushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Abe, Takao c/o Sony Energytec Inc. 1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-cho Koriyama Fukushima-ken / JP | 03 /
Nagaura, Toru c/o Sony Energytec Inc. 1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-cho Koriyama Fukushima-ken / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Mochiyuki c/o Sony Energytec Inc. 1-1, Aza-Shimosugishita Takakura Hiwada-cho Koriyama Fukushima-ken / JP | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/45] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/17] | Patentanwälte TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89119366.6 | 18.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | JP19880265783 | 21.10.1988 Original published format: JP 26578388 | JP19890105197 | 25.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10519789 | JP19890106584 | 26.04.1989 Original published format: JP 10658489 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364995 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364995 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0364995 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/34, H01M4/48, H01M2/12 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/574 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/578 (EP,US);
H01M2200/20 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1990/17] | H01M2/34, H01M4/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/17] | Title | German: | Zelle mit einem stromunterbrechenden Ventil | [1998/20] | English: | Cell having current cutoff valve | [1990/17] | French: | Pile à soupape coupe-circuit | [1990/17] |
Former [1990/17] | Zelle mit einem stromunterbrechendem Ventil | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59228357 ; | [A]JP63228573 ; | [X]FR1105746 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE1939360 (SONOTONE CORP); | [A]US3939011 (ZALESKI JOHN F); | [A]US4035552 (EPSTEIN JAMES); | [A]US4567031 (RILEY BRIAN [US]); | [A]EP0243926 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [XP]US4788112 (KUNG CHIN-CHUNG [TW]); | [XP]EP0327366 (EVER READY LTD [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 102 (E-312)[1825], 4th May 1985; & JP-A-59 228 357 (NIHON DENCHI K.K.) 21-12-1984, & JP59228357 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 26 (E-706)[3374], 20th January 1989; & JP-A-63 228 573 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO., LTD) 22-09-1988, & JP63228573 A 00000000 |