EP0367058 - New composition for dynamicofunctional impressions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pasini, Giovanni Via Giuseppe Giusti 2/2 I-20059 Vimercate / IT | [1990/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Mayer, Hans Benno de Dominicis & Mayer Piazzale Marengo 6 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Mayer, Hans Benno, Dipl.-Ing. de Dominicis & Mayer Piazzale Marengo 6 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89119598.4 | 23.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | IT19880022057 | 04.11.1988 Original published format: IT 2205788 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367058 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367058 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/10 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
C08L31/04 (EP,US);
A61K6/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/19] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung zur Herstellung von dynamischen Funktionsabdrücken | [1990/19] | English: | New composition for dynamicofunctional impressions | [1990/19] | French: | Composition pour empreintes dynamico fonctionnelles | [1990/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 06.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/29] | 17.02.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/29] | Request for further processing for: | 10.03.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.05.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1073688 | [A] - BR. DENT. J., vol. 164, no. 11, 11th June 1988, pages 357-360, London, GB; D. BROWN: "Resilient soft liners and tissue conditioners" | [A] - R.W. PHILLIPS: "Skinner's science of dental materials", 8th edition, 1982, W.B. Saunders & Co., Philadelphia, US |